Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Baxley, Brandi Key, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baxley, Joshua Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PETITONER'S FLORIDA SHARED PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY PARENT EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION COURSE CERTIFICATION OF COURSE COMPLETION | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE FOR JOSHUA BRYAN BAXLEY | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER-PETITION | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $295.00 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $295.00 Receipt Number MX 2023011023 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.