Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Meadows, Randi Leigh, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received: $6.00 Receipt Number MX 2024000124 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME(ADULT) | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: GARCIA , ANA M HONORABLE assigned | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023DR000287DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.