Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Blount, Angela N, St Of Fl Dor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mcdaniel, John E, against Pollocks, Philip, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with HIGHTOWER-SMITH, JACQUELINE DENISE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: PHILIP POLLOCKS 11/14/23 | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PHILLIP POLLOCKS | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Attorney: JOHN MCDANIEL Assigned to ST OF FL DOR | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , JACQUELINE H Assigned | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023DR000286DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2023 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAMILY LAW RULE 12.040(C)(2 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.