Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson, Mary L, St Of Fl Dor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kirkland, Sandor, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with HIGHTOWER-SMITH, JACQUELINE DENISE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE ORDER COMPELLING GENETIC TESTING | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT- DEFAULT ENTERED 10/04/2023 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO SANDOR KIRKLAND ON 09/13/23 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023DR000268DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2023 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED: 9/1/23 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAMILY LAW RULE 12.040(C )(2) | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PATERNITY STATEMENT BY NON-PARENT | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.