Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, David Gary, Smith, Rachel A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Roberts, John Young, against Ballard, Regina L, Brogniez, Angela, Desercey, Hilda M, Mooneyham, Milton M Jr, Nobles, Katrina Burch, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by plaintiffs David Gary Smith and Rachel A. Smith against defendants Hilda M. DeSercey, Angela Brogniez, Regina Ballard, Katrina Nobles, and Milton M. Mooneyham Jr. The purpose of the complaint is to establis...
SUMMONS ISSUED: 10/3/2023
Date: October 02, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: October 02, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 02, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 02, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: October 02, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 02, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2023-00-04
Date: October 03, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 10, 2023RECEIPT
Date: October 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRAD NOBLES FOR KATRINA NOBLES 10/12/23
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MILTON M. MOONEYHAM 10/17/2023
Date: October 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: REGINA BALLARD 10/11/2023
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: October 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANGELA BROGNIEZ 10/19/2023
Date: October 20, 2023OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: October 18, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 30, 2023ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: November 06, 2023DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE
Date: November 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HILDA DESERCEY 10/17/2023
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF MILTON MOONEYHAM FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR ANSWER
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ANSWER FROM MILTON MONEYHAM JR
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ANSWER FROM MILTON MONEYHAM JR | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF MILTON MOONEYHAM FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR ANSWER | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MILTON M. MOONEYHAM 10/17/2023 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HILDA DESERCEY 10/17/2023 | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRAD NOBLES FOR KATRINA NOBLES 10/12/23 | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANGELA BROGNIEZ 10/19/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.