Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Burnett, Megan J, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Milton, A Clay, against Jarmon, Claude L, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: August 28, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: August 28, 2023RECEIPT
Date: August 28, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: August 28, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 05, 2023OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 07, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: August 30, 2023MAIL RETURNED ERICA JACKSON
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED ERICA JACKSON | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: GARCIA , ANA M HONORABLE Assigned | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BAUR , ERIN E MAGISTRATE Assigned | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.