Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Selene Finance Lp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Church, Kelley Louise, against Lucas, Terra Ann, Peacock, Michael D, Unknown Spouse Of Michael D Pe, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with BAUR, ERIN ELIZABETH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 16, 2023VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE
Date: June 16, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 16, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: June 16, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED:06/16/2023
Date: June 16, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: 06/16/2023
Date: June 16, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: June 21, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: June 16, 2023RECEIPT
Date: June 16, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TERRA ANN LUCAS 06/28/2023
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NOT FOUND
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL D PEACOCK 06/28/2023
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANTS NOT FOUND
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NOT FOUND
Date: July 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2 NOT FOUND
Date: July 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL D PEACOCK 7/28/23
Date: July 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TERRA ANN LUCAS N/K/A TERRA PEACOCK 6/28/23
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 02, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NOT FOUND | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2 NOT FOUND | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL D PEACOCK 7/28/23 | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL D PEACOCK: TERRA ANN LUCAS A/K/A TERRA PEACOCK IS THE SPOUSE OF MICHAEL PEACOCK | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TERRA ANN LUCAS N/K/A TERRA PEACOCK 6/28/23 | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TERRA ANN LUCAS IS THE SPOUSE OF MICHAEL PEACOCK 06/28/2023 | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TERRA ANN LUCAS 06/28/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.