Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Southwest Stage Funding, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Carey, Molly Emma, against Moats, Trenton, The Unknown Spouse Of Trenton, The Unknown Tenant In Possessi, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with BAUR, ERIN ELIZABETH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON MOATS - 6/5/2023
Date: June 05, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: TRENTON MOATS - 6/5/2023
Date: June 05, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: June 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION - 6/5/2023
Date: June 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON MOATS
Date: July 12, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NOT FOUND
Date: July 12, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 06/27/2023
Date: July 06, 2023RECEIPT
Date: June 05, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: June 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON MOATS 06/29/2023
Date: July 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 07/01/2023
Date: July 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 07/01/2023
Date: July 12, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSESSION 07/01/2023
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON MOATS 06/29/2023 | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 07/01/2023 | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSESSION 07/01/2023 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON MOATS | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NOT FOUND | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 07/01/2023 | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TRENTON MOATS 06/27/2023 | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.