Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Societ, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Gassel, Gary Ira, against Debra L Webster, Edwin Caplinger, John J Webster Jr, Tenant Iv Unknown Tenant, Unknown Spouse Of Debra L Webs, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with BAUR, ERIN ELIZABETH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF RELATED CASES
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: EDWIN CAPLINGER - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA L. WESBTER - 6/15/2023
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDWIN CAPLINGER - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 31, 2023RECEIPT
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN J WEBSTER JR. - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. WEBSTER JR. - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO: DEBRA L WEBSTER - FORWARD TIME EXT RTN TO SENDER
Date: June 21, 2023MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO: JOHN J WEBSTER JR - FORWARD TIME EXP RTN TO SENDER
Date: June 21, 2023MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR
Date: June 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF OF MAILING
Date: June 21, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: DEBRA L. WEBSTER - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023SUGGESTION OF DEATH
Date: June 23, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA L. WEBSTER - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: TENANT I/UNKNOWN TENANT - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023ORDER APPOINTING ELISOR
Date: June 29, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: TENANT II/ UNKNOWN TENANT - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT - 6/1/2023
Date: May 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DEBRA L. WEBSTER 07/14/2023
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: June 05, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: May 31, 2023RECEIPT
Date: June 01, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. WEBSTER, JR
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA L. WEBSTER 07/14/2023
Date: July 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TENANT IV/ UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOHN J. WEBSTER , JR.
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TENANT II/ UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDWIN CAPLINGER
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. WEBSTER JR. 07/14/2023
Date: July 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TENANT I/ UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA L. WEBSTER
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: DEBRA L. WEBSTER
Date: June 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: EDWIN CAPLINGER
Date: June 14, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEBRA L. WEBSTER - 6/15/2023
Date: June 15, 2023RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Date: August 01, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN J WEBSTER JR. - 6/15/2023
Date: June 15, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. WEBSTER JR. - 6/15/2023
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION/COPY TO
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: October 11, 2023MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO: UNKNOWN
Date: August 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: August 14, 2023STIPULATION TO JUDGMENT
Date: September 20, 2023MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J WEBSTER JR
Date: August 24, 2023MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA WESTER
Date: September 06, 2023ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: October 17, 2023ORDER ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO JUDGMENT
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF OF MAILING
Date: October 18, 2023DEFENDANTS, DEBRA L. WEBSTER AND JOHN J. WEBSTER, JR'S NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2023ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: November 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF OF MAILING: NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 07, 2023REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM, AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM, AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM, AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF OF MAILING: NOTICE OF ACTION | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS, DEBRA L. WEBSTER AND JOHN J. WEBSTER, JR'S NOTICE | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION/COPY TO | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 11/7/2023 dismissed UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDWIN CAPLINGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.