Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bontrager, Carolyn, Bontrager, Reuben, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Kuhn, Eriselda, against State Farm Florida Insurance C, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: May 22, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: 05/23/2023
Date: May 22, 2023RECEIPT
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to REUBEN BONTRAGER | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2023005415 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: GARCIA , ANA M HONORABLE Assigned | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023CA000139CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/22/2023 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.