Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Moore, Jesse, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Kespohl, Jeremy Alan, against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGARCIA, ANA MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: FORD MOTOR COMPANY - 4/25/2023
Date: April 25, 2023COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUEST
Date: April 25, 2023INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 25, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 25, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSION
Date: April 25, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: April 25, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 03, 2023FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 09, 2023RECEIPT
Date: April 25, 2023FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 09, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND INCORPORATED MOTION TO STRIKE | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023CA000124CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/25/2023 | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to JESSE MOORE | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.