Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sloan, Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sloan, Johnny, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGARCIA, ANA MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CLERK | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AND MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT : HUSBANDS | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.