Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sorenson, Jennifer Starr, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.