Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guthrie, Dale, Guthrie, John, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cremeens, Patrick J, against General Motors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT, GNEREAL MOTORS LLC | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 1/22/16 | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2016000135 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.