Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Settlement Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Other case represented by Neal, Thomas Frederick, against The Supplemental Needs Trust O, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2015 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - BEFORE RECORDING | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF FINAL REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM WITH RESPECT TO THE APPRAOVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM - SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED TRANSFER | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 05-19-15 @ 9:30 AM CST | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.