Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Stursberg, Linda, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2024 |
CategoryGuardianship Or Guardian Advocacy With Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2024009682 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN/GUARDIAN ADVOCATE | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLENARY GUARDIAN | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/11/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 GA 000030 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PEREZ, RAUL ASSIGNED | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S LETTER RE:CONFIDENTIALITY | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO PEREZ, RAUL RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312024GA000030AXXXVB WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: RETLTR-3/11/2024 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.