Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kiefer, Louisalynn Brown, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2024 |
CategorySummary Administration, Estate $1000 Or More |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2024007844 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | FUNERAL BILL | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/27/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 CP 000245 | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3680.2140. / 3120240009254) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: SWAN, MICHAEL J ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.