Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kelly, Deannne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Drinkard, Don J, Drinkard, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024008853
Date: March 08, 2024PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2024008474
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024008853 | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO KORETSKY, JAY RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312024CA000140AXXXVB WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS: EFSUMM-3/6/2024 **EMAILED SUMMONS LINDA DRINKARD AND DON DRINKARD JR** | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: LINDA DRINKARD | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: DON DRINKARD JR | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2024008474 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | * NO SUMMONS FILED WITH CASE AT THIS TIME- ZB*** | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/05/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 CA 000140 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: LINDA DRINKARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.