Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Guzman, Teresa Marie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Strowd, Chasya, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2024008322
Date: March 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2024008322 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO GILLIN, ERIC S RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312024CA000137AXXXVB WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFSUMM-3/1/2024 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GILLIN, ERIC S ASSIGNED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: CHASYA STROWD | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/01/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 CA 000137 | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (CHASYA STROWD) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (SHERRY NUTTER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.