Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Enriquez, Dana, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Earl'S Hideaway Lounge Inc, Pollack, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2024 |
CategoryNegl-Premises Liability-Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2024005776
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2024005776 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ODOM, JASON L ASSIGNED | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO ODOM, JASON L RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312024CA000088AXXXVB WITH 3 ATTACHMENTS: EFSUMM-2/12/2024 ***SUMMONS FOR EARL'S HIDEAWAY AND MICHAL POLLACK EMAILED*** | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: EARL'S HIDEAWAY LOUNGE INC | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL POLLACK | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/12/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 CA 000088 | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.