Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nelson, Georgia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gagnon, Lindsey Joyce, Meeks Plumbing Inc, Meeks Plumbing Inc., in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Georgia Nelson against Lindsey Joyce Gagnon and Meeks Plumbing, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages in excess of $50,000. Georgia Nelson, the plaintiff, is a resident of Brevard County, Florida, while Li...
PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024004096
Date: February 02, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 30, 2024PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2024004003
Date: February 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024004096 | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2024004003 | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: LINDSEY JOYCE GAGNON | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: MEEKS PLUMBING INC | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO NORBRATEN, TODD M RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312024CA000052AXXXVB WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS: EFSUMM-1/31/2024 ***SUMMONS FOR LINDSEY JOYCE GAGNON AND MEEKS PLUMBING INC EMAILED*** | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: NORBRATEN, TODD M ASSIGNED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ***SUMMONS NOT PROVIDED @ THIS TIME*** | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ***SUMMONS NOT INCLUDED WITH ORIGINAL COMPLAINT*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.