Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bagrowski, Karen, Bagrowski, Karey, Unknown Spouse Of Karen Bagrowski, Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Proper, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2024 |
CategoryNonhomstd Res Forecl $50000-$249000 |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
The document is a foreclosure action filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation against Karey Bagrowski, Karen Bagrowski, and unknown tenants in possession of a property in Indian River County, Florida. It outlines a default on a promissory note and mortg...
VERIFIED COMPLAINT (COUNT I)
Date: January 25, 2024PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024014125
Date: April 15, 2024NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.3675.1245. / 3120240004448)
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS (UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREY BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREY M. BAGROWSKI)
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY (UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREY BAGROWSKI AKA)
Date: February 13, 2024SUMMONS (UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY)
Date: January 25, 2024PAYMENT $1,103.00 RECEIPT #2024003444
Date: January 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PRPERTY - S: 2/12/2024)
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF FILING (CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE)
Date: January 25, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS (KAREY BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREY M. BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREY MARIE BAGROWSKI)
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS (KAREN BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREN M. BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREN MARIE BAGROWSKI)
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY (KAREN BAGROWSKI)
Date: February 21, 2024VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: February 21, 2024SUMMONS (UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREN BAGROWSKI A/K/A KAREN M. BAGROWSKI)
Date: January 25, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE (KAREN BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN M BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN MARIE BAGROWSKI - NOT FOUND)
Date: February 27, 2024COPY OF ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER 2021-05
Date: January 25, 2024FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: April 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2024014125 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.3690.2138. / 3120240017739) | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (KAREY BAGROWSKI AKA KAREY M BAGROWSKI AKA KAREY MARIE BAGROWSKI - S: 2/12/24) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PRPERTY - S: 2/12/2024) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREN BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN M BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN MARIE BAGROWSKI - NOT FOUND) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (KAREN BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN M BAGROWSKI AKA KAREN MARIE BAGROWSKI - NOT FOUND) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREY BAGROWSKI AKA KAREY M BAGROWSKI AKA KAREY MARIE BAGROWSKI - NOT FOUND) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.