Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Isozaki, Ryota, against Gannon, Ronda, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. ENTERED AS REQUESTED. RYOTA ISOZAKI (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO: (F) CV COURT OSC FAILURE TO COMPLY CRC 3.70E COND Sent on: 09/29/2021 16:27:00.48 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: TENTATIVE RULING - NO APPEARANCE
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: COURT'S OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY Date: 11/09/2021 Time: 10:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 03/09/2022 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: COURT'S OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY Date: 11/09/2021 Time: 10:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 03/09/2022 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT HEARNG DATE 09/29/21 RYOTA ISOZAKI (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | INTAKE SHEET - RECEIVED AND DESTROYED | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: TENTATIVE RULING - NO APPEARANCE
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.