Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Buenos Aires, Matias Sebastian D Uva, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $176.80 | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO GILA CORP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $176.80 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 11/29/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $113.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 009401 A | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 11/22/2021 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION 3936WQN FILED, OFFENSE DATE 10/23/2021 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - 3936WQN | |
October 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SEQ: 1 - () | |
October 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION 3936WQN FILED, OFFENSE DATE 10/23/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.