Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Jacques, Lafrance, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEETVIE | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEETVIE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2021034203 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AEETVIE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 10/22/2021 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 009371 A | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEETVIE | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.