Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Nieves, Hector Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | DDS CERT RECD | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H SCHOOL OR 316.001 SEQ: 1 | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UUTE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UUTE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 90 DAYS TO COMPLETE SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 02/13/2022 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC SCHOOL ELECTED | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $177.00 RECEIPT #2021036050 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 009360 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.