Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Perez Contreas, Jancely Cecilia, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $118.00 RECEIPT #2021035334 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UUXE | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 009357 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 11/5/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 11/5/2021 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UUXE | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UUXE | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 009357 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.