Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Rocafuerte, Ronald Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1V6HE | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1V6HE | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $113.00 RECEIPT #2021036249 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DL RECORD | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/16/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 11/22/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.