Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Ribeiro, Gilza Barreto, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEETQNE | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEETQNE | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $98.00 RECEIPT #2021032162 | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIVED PERSONAL CHECK FROM DEFENDANT; SENT LETTER ADVISING PERSONAL CHECKS NOT ACCEPTED | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER MAILED TO DEFENDANT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 10/06/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEETQNE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.