Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Bradley, Joseph Lee, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UHQE | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UHQE | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2022007056 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $45.50 RECEIPT #2022007027 | |
January 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLETION CERTIFICATE-DRIVING SCHOOL | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/20/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $45.50 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF DID NOT ATTEND DDS;WILL RECEIVE PTS FOR THIS CITATION | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 90 DAYS TO COMPLETE SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 12/12/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.