Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Steigerwalt, Katelyn Alexis, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
PAYMENT $136.00 RECEIPT #2021031374
Date: September 30, 2021CITATION AF1UHOE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/02/2021
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2023021821 | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARANCE LETTER MAILED TO DEF AND FAXED TO TEXAS DMV | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UHOE | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UHOE | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RECEIVED FROM LINEBARGER $50.00 | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $65.00 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.