Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Calvillio Narciso, Ivan, Calvillo, Ivan, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
COURT RECEIPT
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022004011 | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 02/06/2022 | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADKLKIE | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADKLKIE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H JUDGE SEQ: 1 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008133 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 12/8/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 12/8/2021 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC: ADJ/W; DEF MUST PAY $100 FINE; $88 CC; $7 SUBPOENA FEE BY 02/06/2022. ATTY GILES PRESENT FOR ATTY UNGER . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.