Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Hughes, Chad Michael, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESP1E | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $211.00 RECEIPT #2021021310 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEESP1E | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 06/03/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $188.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 05/27/2021 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 004340 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.