Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Brown, Brittany Leandra, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $157.30 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 03/26/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $98.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 03/16/2021 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADKL64E | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADKL64E FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/14/2021 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 001546 A | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET | |
February 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (320.07(3 A)) OPER.VEH./USING MOB.HOME W/EXPIRED REGISTRATION-6MO OR LESS | |
February 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADKL64E FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/14/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.