Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Perez Garcia, Imelda, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION AEERMPE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/05/2021
Date: February 05, 2021PAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2021004171
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEERMPE | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEERMPE | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2021004171 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH TRAFFIC CITATION REQUIRED BY: 03/07/2021 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 001281 A | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AEERMPE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/05/2021 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.