Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Scherr, Harold E, against Brown, Gilda, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $501 - $2500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 31, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: (UNEXCUTED)
Date: October 05, 2021PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021032205
Date: October 07, 2021NON-SERVICE RETURN (GILDA BROWN)
Date: November 11, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: GILDA BROWN
Date: October 25, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED: GILDA BROWN
Date: September 03, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3538.241. / 3120220029389)
Date: April 01, 2022NON-SERVICE RETURN (GILDA BROWN)
Date: October 01, 2021PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021028956
Date: September 08, 2021SUMMONS
Date: October 04, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 03, 2021SUMMONS (FOR INFORMATION ONLY)
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3538.241. / 3120220029389) | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTIONS SET FOR 05/05/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-SERVICE RETURN (GILDA BROWN) | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO NOT FOUND | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: GILDA BROWN | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/18/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.