Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sarao, Tony J Jr, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2021LIVE WARRANT ISSUED:
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO STATE OF FLORIDA RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM000019AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: OR-9/13/2022 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT / GRADUATED FROM MENTAL HEALTH COURT | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CHARGES | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $228.50 RECEIPT #2022028631 | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | MENTAL HEALTH COURT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 09/13/2022 AT 2:00 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT / COMPLIANT WITH MHC CONDITIONS / DEFENDANT TO CONTACT LEWIS TO ATTEND 1X1 GRAD GROUP CLASS / DEFENDANT MUST PAY ALL FEES PRIOR TO GRADUATION DATE / NEXT COURT DATE 09/13/2022 AT 2:00 PM | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE COX FOR JUDGE MENZ | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MENTAL HEALTH COURT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 08/30/2022 AT 2:00 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.