Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Da Silva, Cristiano Moreira, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 25, 2021CITATION AAO5KAE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 10/23/2021
Date: October 25, 2021SURETY BOND AS6K-796024 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: October 25, 2021PARTIAL PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT
Date: March 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $237.24 RECEIPT #2023000912 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 01/27/2023 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO MODIFY PROBATION | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT009412AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFCMP-12/27/2022 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $81.92 RECEIPT #2022039710 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $81.92 RECEIPT #2022035744 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2022032094 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2022029052 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.