Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dolce, Billy, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UVVE | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT009408AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFNOLPROSE-2/25/2022 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21-717938 (322.34 2 M S 613 5405) RELEASED | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UVVE | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022001759 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UVVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.