Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barker, Roberta J, Steele, Virginia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Barker As Personal Representative Of, Roberta J, Barker, Roberta J, Jp Morgan Chase Bank Na, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration, Including Ancillary, Curatorship And Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023031604 | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO ROOT, MEGAN NAOMI RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CP000039XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: 5339-8/31/2023 ***SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS*** | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA) | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS ISSUED: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AGREED SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT ***PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PLAINTIFF - SAME PARTIES*** | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT **SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - ADDS DEF: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA*** | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT III FOR ACCOUNTING OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 07/18/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 8/ , JDG: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.