Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ithink Financial Credit Union, filed a(n) Matter Involving Claims More Than $8000 But Less Than $15,000 case represented by Cohen, Marc B, against Brown, Vanessa T, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatter Involving Claims More Than $8000 But Less Than $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by iTHINK Financial Credit Union (formerly known as IBM Southeast Employees Credit Union) against Vanessa T. Brown in the County Court of the 19th Judicial Circuit in Indian River County, Florida. The case number is 312021CC00...
MOTION, NOTICE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3531.1615. / 3120220024488)
Date: March 07, 2022PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021034420
Date: October 28, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 25, 2021CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: October 26, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2021SUMMONS - VANESSA T BROWN
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3531.1615. / 3120220024488) | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTIONS SET FOR 04/14/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021034420 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: VANESSA T BROWN | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO COHEN, MARC B RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CC002109XXXXXX WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS: EFSUMM-10/25/2021,EFCCMPO-10/26/2021 ***SUMMONS & CCMPO - VANESSA T BROWN*** | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: COHEN, MARC B ASSIGNED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.