Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Moore, April Bott, filed a(n) Other case against Moore, Robert Dean, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts Circuit with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
DEFENDANT’S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 09, 2022PAYMENT $415.00 RECEIPT #2021021586
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.3438.812. / 3120210046783)
Date: June 25, 2021DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ROBERT DEAN MOORE)
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 05, 2022SUMMONS
Date: June 25, 2021VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2021ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: May 24, 2022DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 22, 2022WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (ROBERT DEAN MOORE)
Date: August 05, 2021PAYMENT $886,316.05 RECEIPT #2022016919
Date: May 27, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ***CHECK #11698 FOR $100.00 M/BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP FOR OVERPAYMENT*** | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ***CHECK #11607 FOR $873,103.00 M/APRIL MOORE C/O ROSSWAY, SWAN, TIERNEY, BARRY & OLIVER PL ON 6/6/22*** | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $886,316.05 RECEIPT #2022016919 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ROBERT DEAN MOORE - RECORDED (OR.3604.2119. / 3120230011003) | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DOMESTICATING AND ENFORCING FOREIGN JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 05/06/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 7/ , JDG: CROOM, JANET C | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.