Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Shim, Anthony Latiek, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION ACWNVUE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 04/18/2021
Date: April 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACWNVUE | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACWNVUE | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLETION CERTIFICATE-DRIVING SCHOOL | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H SCHOOL OR 316.001 SEQ: 1 | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $238.50 RECEIPT #2021016328 | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 90 DAYS TO COMPLETE SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 08/12/2021 | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC SCHOOL ELECTED | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 05/18/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.