Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Hussain, Farhan A, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DDS CERTIFICATE - COURT ORDERED | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $253.00 RECEIPT #2021025272 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEESFQE | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESFQE | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H JUDGE SEQ: 1 | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC; ADJ/W; DEF MUST PAY $158 FINE; $88 CC; $7 SUBPOENA FEE AND SUBMIT COMPLETION CERTIFICATE FOR 4 HRS CRT ORDERED DDS BY 08/22/2021. ATTY REGENT PRESENT FOR ATTY SMITH. | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 003979 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 6/23/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 6/23/2021 | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : COURT ORDERED SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 08/22/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.