Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Cruz, David, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AED39TE | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AED39TE | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $218.40 RECEIPT #2021031380 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CLEARANCE LETTER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $218.40 | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 02/18/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $145.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.