Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kowalski, Kristian Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ARREST AFFIDAVIT - (COPY)
Date: September 07, 2021NO INFORMATION
Date: September 17, 2021LETTER TO DEPOSITOR REGARDING CASH BOND BALANCE
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASH BOND 154123 (856.011 M S 5316) RELEASED | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $500.00 RECEIPT #2021032246 FROM CASH BOND #154123 | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND DISBURSEMENT FORM | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR RETURN OF CASH BOND | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO CHRZAN, ADAM RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001319AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFNOINFO-9/17/2021 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO DEPOSITOR REGARDING CASH BOND BALANCE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001319AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFNOINFO-9/17/2021 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.