Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Radden, Alysia Marie, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022005799 | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $398.00 RECEIPT #2022005720 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/08/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $418.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF DEFAULTED ON PAYMENT PLAN-MUST PAY IN FULL | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008075AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERTI-9/23/2021 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESRZE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.