Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Souza Lamont, Diana L, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration, Including Ancillary, Curatorship And Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 8/ , JDG: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF HEARING AND SELF EXECUTING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.3484.2459. / 3120210080094) | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.3482.69. / 3120210077977) | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 11/08/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 8/ , JDG: LINN, MICHAEL | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE WITHDRAWING THE PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND STRIKE FROM THE COURT RECORD | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.