Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garrett, Cheryl, Garrett, Lisa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grall, Patrick M, against Van Hezewyk, Gail Meredith, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Garrett and Cheryl Lynn Garrett against Defendant Gail Meredith Van Hezewyk in the Circuit Court of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit in Indian River County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of t...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 19, 2021DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, LISA GARRETT
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, CHERYL GARRETT
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S PERSONAL INJURY INTERROGATOIRES TO PLAITNIFF, LISA GARRETT
Date: September 23, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2021DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES (GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK)
Date: September 09, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021028843
Date: September 07, 2021DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S PERSONAL INJURY INTERROGATORIES TO PLIANTIFF, CHERYL GARRETT
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK’S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK SVD: 9/3/21)
Date: September 15, 2021SUMMONS - GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, LISA GARRETT | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, CHERYL GARRETT | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S PERSONAL INJURY INTERROGATOIRES TO PLAITNIFF, LISA GARRETT | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK'S PERSONAL INJURY INTERROGATORIES TO PLIANTIFF, CHERYL GARRETT | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK’S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK SVD: 9/3/21) | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES (GAIL MEREDITH VAN HEZEWYK) | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: BLOOM, JASON ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.