Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brown, Crystal Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
JUDGMENT ISSUED $496.50 - Recorded (OR.3384.1708. / 3120210007903)
Date: February 04, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 17, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF COLLECTIONS - FINES AND COSTS DUE IN 30 DAYS
Date: April 30, 2021FINGERPRINT CARD
Date: November 16, 2020CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3384.1807. / 3120210007928)
Date: February 04, 2021ARREST AFFIDAVIT - RCVD FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY
Date: November 10, 2020PLEA IN ABSENTIA
Date: November 04, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR BRADY MATERIAL
Date: October 21, 2020PUBLIC DEFENDER GRANTED
Date: October 20, 2020NOTICE OF FORFEITURE
Date: July 23, 2020BENCH WARRANT ISSUED:
Date: July 23, 2020COURT RECEIPT
Date: July 23, 2020INFORMATION FILED (ORIGINAL)
Date: April 28, 2020PLEA FORM
Date: June 23, 2020INFORMATION FILED
Date: April 28, 2020COURT RECEIPT
Date: June 23, 2020SURETY BOND U6-20785503 POSTED $500.00
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 16, 2020ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 02, 2020JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE
Date: November 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $696.80 | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COLLECTIONS - FINES AND COSTS DUE IN 30 DAYS | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ISSUED $496.50 - Recorded (OR.3384.1708. / 3120210007903) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3384.1807. / 3120210007928) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312020MM000611AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFJDGSENT-11/12/2020 | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 10 DAY NOTICE REQUIRED BY: 01/15/2021 | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312020MM000611AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFJDGSENT-11/12/2020 | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINT CARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.